NAME | ASSIGNMENT | DATE OF AWARD |
EBEL, Paul | Uffz., Gruppenfhr. i.d. Stabskp.(Pi-Zug)/Gren.Rgt. 50 | RK: 17.02.43 |
EBELING, Heinz | Lt., Staffelkpt. _./JG 26 "Schlageter" | RK: 5.11.40 |
EBELING, Werner | RK: Major, Kdr. II.Btl./ Gren.Rgt. 220 EL: Obstlt., Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 154 |
RK: 9.04.44; EL (763.): 5.03.45 |
EBENER, Kurt | Feld., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. II./JG 3 "Udet" | RK: 7.04.43 |
EBERBACH, Heinrich (*24.11.1895 in Stuttgart; + 13.07.1992) |
RK: Obstlt., Kdr. Pz.Rgt. 35 EL: Promotions: Gen.d.Pz.Tr.: 1.08.43; Gen.Lt.: 1.01.43; Gen.Maj.: 1.02.42; Oberst: 1.08.40; Obstlt.: 1.10.37; Polizei-Major: 1.03.33 (transferred from Polizei to Heer at that rank, 1.07.35); Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt.: 25.02.15 (Pat. 23.06.13); Fjk.: 1.06.14 Taken prisoner, Normandy, 30.08.1944. |
RK: 4.07.40; EL (42.): 31.12.41; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK I; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK II; 1914 EK I; 1914 EK II; Panzerkampfabzeichen in Silber; Verwundetenabzeichen, 1939 in Schwarz |
EBERHARDT, Erich (* 19.10.1913 in Wiesbaden / Hessen; + 1.07.1965 in Lohrheim / Hessen) |
RK: SS-Ostubaf., Ia 3.SS-Pz.Div. "Totenkopf" Promotions: SS-Ostubaf.: ; |
RK: 23.08.44; EK I: 11.09.41; EK II: 13.07.41; Ostmedaille; Medaille zur Erinnerung an den 1. Okt. 1938; Medaille zur Erinnerung an den 13. Mar. 1938 |
EBERHARDT, Friedrich-Georg (* 15.01.1892 in Straßburg / Elsaß;; + ) |
RK: Gen.Lt., Kdr. 60.Inf.Div. (mot.) Promotions: Gen.Lt.: 1.02.41; Gen.Maj.: 1.04.39; Oberst: 1.07.35; Obstlt.: 1.10.33; Major: ; Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt.: 10.09.11 (Pat. 18.09.09); Fjk.: 11.03.10 |
RK: 31.12.41; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK I; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK II; 1914 EK I; 1914 EK II |
EBERHARDT, Georg (* 27.02.1914 in Frankenhausen; + 08.1943 near Andrejawka / Issjum on the Donez) |
RK: SS-Stubaf., Kdr. estn.SS-Pz.Gren.Btl. "Narwa" | RK: 4.08.43; EK I: 1.09.41; EK II: 11.08.41 |
EBERBACH, Hans (+ 31.05.1944) |
RK: Oblt., Staffelkpt. i.d. II./KG 76 | RK: 8.08.44 |
EBERSPÄCHER, Helmut | Hptm., Staffelkpt. i.d. Nachtschlacht-Gruppe20 | 26.01.45 |
EBERT, Franz (* 12.05.1914 in Abtsgmünd / Kreis Aalen / Württemberg; + 1.10.1972 in Ulm an der Donau) |
RK: Oblt.d.R., Chef 10.Bttr./Flak-Rgt.23 (mot) | RK: 17.04.45; EK I; EK II |
EBINGER, Edwin (+ 4.03.1944) |
Ofw., Kp.Truppfhr. i.d. 12./Geb.Jäg.Rgt. 13 | 4.11.43 |
EBKE, August-Friedrich | Obstlt.d.R., Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 464 | 14.04.45 |
EBNER, Adam | Ofw., Zugfhr. i.d. 3./Geb.Jäg.Rgt. 137 | 19.11.41 |
EBNER, Fridolin | Ofw., Zugf. i.d. 9./Gren.Rgt. 7 | 28.10.44 |
ECK, Josef | Hptm., Fhr. 4.Komp./Pz.Rgt. 4 | 15.07.44 |
ECKARDT, Reinhold (Ý 30.07.1942 near Brussels) |
Oblt.,Adj. II./NJG 1 | 30.08.41 |
ECKHARDT, Hermann | Feldw., Zugfhr. i.d. 1./Pz.Abt. 8 | 28.03.45 |
ECKARDT, Willi | Major, Kdr. III.Btl. / Gren.Rgt. 521 | 7.12.43 |
ECKEBRECHT, Fritz | Oblt., Beob. i.d. 4.(H)/Aufkl.Gruppe 31 | 9.11.44 |
ECKER, Paul | RK: Major, Kdr. I.Btl. / Pz.Gren.Rgt. 9 EL: Major, Kdr. I.Btl. / Pz.Gren.Rgt. 9 |
RK: 16.03.44; EL (634.): 28.10.44 |
ECKERLE, Franz (* 24.04.1912 in Baden-Baden; MIA 14.02.1942 near Welikije Luki as Hptm., Kdr. I./JG 54 "Grünherz") |
RK: Hptm., Staffelkpt. i.d. I./JG 54 "Grünherz" EL: |
RK: 18.09.41; EL (82.): 12.03.42 |
ECKERT, Alois (Y´ 12.10.1943 as Ofw.) |
Feldw., Zugfhr. i.d. 9.Komp./Pz.Rgt. 33 | 3.08.42 |
ECKERT, Ernst (+ 27.07.1944 as Hptm.d.R.) |
Lt. Fhr. 11.Komp./Jäg.Rgt. 229 | 9.06.44 |
ECKERT, Hans | SS-Ostuf., Fhr. II./SS-Pz.Gren.Rgt. 3 "Deutschland" / SS-Pz.Kampfgr. "Das Reich" | RK: 4.05.44 |
ECKHARDT, Alfons (+ 11.08.1942) |
Major, Kdr. III./Inf.Rgt. 11 (mot.) | 6.10.42 |
ECKHARDT, Johann-Heinrich | RK: Oberst, Kdr. Jäg.Rgt. 38 EL: |
RK: 20.05.42; EL (644.): 3.11.44 |
ECKHARDT, Wilhelm | Hptm.d.R.,Kdr. II.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 503 | 17.09.44 |
ECKHOLT, Oskar | Oberst, Kdr. Art.Rgt.178 | RK: 9.04.43 |
ECKINGER, Dr. Josef-Franz (+ 17.10.1941; Posthumously promoted Obstlt.) |
Hptm., Kdr. II./Schtz.Rgt. 1 (RK); (First Eichenlaubträger in 1.Pz.Div.) |
RK: 17.03.41; EL (48.): 31.12.41 |
ECKSTEIN, Fritz (* 27.01.1923 in Schwaikheim / Württemberg; + 4.04.1979 in Schwaikheim / Württemberg) |
RK: SS-Rottenfhr., Richtschtz. i.d. 1./SS-Pz.Jäger-Abt. 12 / 12.SS-Pz.Div. "Hitlerjugend" / I.SS-Pz.Korps / SS-Pz.AOK 6 / OB West Promotions: SS-USchaf.: ; SS-Rttf.: ; |
RK: 18.11.44; EK I: 8.08.44; EK II: 1.11.41; Inf.Stu.Abz.; Verw.Abz.; Ostmedaille |
EDELSHEIM, Maximilian Reichsfreiherr von(6.07.1897 in Berlin; + 26.04.1994) |
RK: Obstlt., Kdr. Radf.Abt. 1 EL: Oberst, Kdr. Pz.Gren.Rgt. 26 Schw. (105.): Gen.Lt., Kdr. 24.Pz.Div. Promotions: Gen.d.Pz.Tr.: 1.12.44; Gen.Lt.: 1.03.44; Gen.Maj.: 1.06.43; Oberst: 1.10.41; Obstlt.: ; Major: ; Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt.: ; |
RK: 30.07.41; EL (162.): 22.12.42; Schw.: 23.10.42; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK I; 1939 Spange zum 1914 EK II; 1914 EK I; 1914 EK II; Panzerkampfabzeichen |
EDER, Anton | Oberst, Abschnittskdt. eines Verteidigungsbereiches in Berlin | 26.03.45 |
EDER, Georg-Peter | RK: Oblt., Staffelkpt. 6./JG 1 EL: |
RK: 24.06.44; EL (663.): 25.11.44 |
EDER, Martin | Hptm., Fhr. I.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 481 | 28.11.40 |
EDHOFER, Heinz | Ofw., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 7./Schlacht-Geschw. 2 "Immelmann" | 30.11.44 |
EDING, Alois | Lt.d.R., Fhr. 1.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 19 | 12.10.43 |
EDSE, Heinrich | Oblt.d.R., Fhr. 1.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 407 | 15.04.44 |
EDTBAUER, Franz (+ 13.04.1944) |
Oblt.d.R., Fhr. 1.Komp./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 11 | 4.06.44 |
EGGEMANN, Walter | Lt.d.R., Ord.Offz. Stab/Gren.Rgt. 680 | 18.04.43 |
EGGEMANN, Wilhelm | RK: Major, Kdr. II.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 94 EL: |
RK: 2004.43; EL (468.): 4.05.44 |
EGGER, Paul (* 26.11.1916 in Mautern / Steiermark, Österreich) |
K: SS-Ostuf., Zugfhr. i.d. 1.Komp./schw.SS-Pz.Abt. 502 | RK: 27.04.45; EK I; EK II; Verw.Abz. |
EGGER, Reinhard | RK: Oblt., Fhr. 10.Komp./Fsch.Jäg.Rgt. 1 EL: |
RK: 9.07.41; EL (510.): 24.06.44 |
EGGERS, Hermann (* 25.10.1914 in Hanau am Main / Hessen) |
RK: Hptm., Chef 3./Flak-Rgt. 64 / Flak-Rgt. (mot.) 18 | RK: 21.08.42; EK I; EK II |
EGGERS, Johann | Uffz., Richtschtz. i.d. 7./Pz.Rgt. 6 | 14.12.43 |
EGGERS, Walter | Oblt., Chef 7.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 116 | 29.08.43 |
EGGERS, Wilhelm | Oblt., Chef 13.(I.G.)/Inf.Rgt. 490 | 16.03.42 |
EGGERSTORFER, Joseph | Obstlt. im Gren.Rgt. 290 / 98.Inf.Div. | 04.45 |
EGGHARDT, Alfred | Lt., Chef 2./Sturmgeschütz-Brig. 912 | 20.04.45 |
EGLE, Kurt | Oblt., Fhr. 8./Luftnacht.Rgt. 53 | 5.07.44 |
EGLSEER, Karl (* 5.07.1890 in Ischl / Kreis Gmünden / Oberdonau Österreich; + 22.06.1944 as Gen.d.Geb.Tr., Kom.Gen. XVII.Geb.Korps, killed in accident) |
RK: Gen.Maj., Kdr. 4.Gebirgs-Div. / XXXXIX.Gebirgs-Armee-Korps / 17.Armee / Heeresgruppe Süd Promotions: Gen.d.Geb.Tr.: 1.03.44; Gen.Lt.: 1.02.43; Gen.Maj.: 1.11.40; Oberst: Transferred from Austrian Bundesheer to German Heer at that rank, 1938 (Pat. 1.02.39); Obstlt.: ; Major: ; Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt. (k.u.k.): 15.12.15 (Pat. 21.05.16) |
RK: 23.10.41; EK I; EK II |
EHINGER, Josef | Oberjäger, Gruppenfhr. i.d. 6.Komp./Geb.Jäg.Rgt. 100 | 22.08.43 |
EHLE, Curt | RK: Hptm., Fhr.1./Kradschz.Btl. 15 EL: |
RK: 27.07.41; EL (673.): 29.11.44 |
EHLE, Walter (+ 17.11.1943 near St. Trond) |
Major, Kdr. II./NJG 1 | 2908.43 |
EHLERS, Hans (+ 27.12.1944 over the Eifel as Major, Kdr. I./JG 1 "Oesau") |
Hptm., Staffelkpt. 3./JG 1 | 14.07.44 |
EHM, Bruno | Ofw., Zugfhr. i.d. 8.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 162 | 1.02.45 |
EHRATH, Fritz (* 8.09.1909 in Karlsruhe; + ) |
RK: SS-Ostubaf., Kdr. SS-Pz.Gren.Rgt. 9 "Germania" / 5.SS-Pz.Div. "Wiking" / 8.Armee / Heeresgruppe Süd, E.Front Promotions: |
RK: 23.02.44; DKiG: 10.01.43; EK I: 1.10.39; EK II: 23.09.39; Pz.Kampfabz.i.Bronze |
EHRENBERGER, Rudolf (K 8.03.1944 in area of Jüterbog) |
Ofw., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 6./JG 53 "Pik As" | RK: 6.04.44; EK I; EK II |
EHRHARDT, Ernst | Uffz., Gruppenfhr. im Gren.Rgt. 481 | 23.03.45 |
EHRIG, Werner | Obstlt.i.G., Ia 22.Inf.Div. (Luftlande) | 26.05.40 |
EHRLER, Heinrich | RK: Lt., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 6./JG 5 EL: Hptm., Kdr. III./JG 5 Promotions: Major: ; 209 aerial victories |
RK: 4.09.42; EL (265.): 2.0.43; EK I; EK II |
EHRT, Günther (+ 20.11.1944) |
Hptm., Fhr. I.Btl./Inf.Rgt. (mot.) 41 | 3.05.42 |
EIBL, Karl (* 23.07.1891 in Steg / Oberdonau / Österreich; + 21.01.1943 as Gen.Lt. m.d.F.b. XXIV.Pz.Korps; Posthumously promoted Gen.d.Inf.) |
RK: Obstlt., Kdr. III.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 131 (later Kdr. Inf.Rgt. 132) EL: Oberst, Kdr. Inf.Rgt. 132 Schw.: Gen.Maj., Kdr. 385.Inf.Div. Promotions: Gen.d.Inf.: 22.01.43 (RDA 1.01.43); Gen.Lt.: 19.12.42; Gen.Maj.: 1.02.42; Oberst: 1.02.41; Obstlt.: 1.01.30 (Pat. 1.02.38); Major: Transferred to German Heer at that rank, 1938 (Pat. 1.06.35); Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt. (k.u.k.): 1.08.14 |
RK: 15.08.40; EL (50.): 31.12.41; Schw. (21.): 19.12.42; EK I; EK II |
EICH, Karl (+ 20.11.43) |
Ofw., Zugf. i.d. 6.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 282 | 20.01.44 |
EICHEL-STREIBER, Diethelm von | Hptm., Staffelkpt. Stabsf./JG 51 "Mölders" | RK: 5.04.44; EK I; EK II |
EICHERT, Hans-Henning (+ 9.07.1943 as Hptm. in a divisional staff) |
Oblt., Chef 6.Komp./Schtz.Rgt. 11 | 14.03.42 |
EICHERT, Robert (+ 23.09.1944) |
Ofw., Zugf. i.d. 8.Komp./Pz.Rgt. 36 | 20.04.43 |
EICHHORN, Hugo (* 11.02.1914 in Weilmunster / Hessen; Ý 27.05.1992) |
SS-Hstuf., Chef _./SS-Pi.Btl. 5 and Kampfgruppenführer in SS-Pz.Gren.Div. "Wiking" / LVII.Pz.Korps / 4.Pz.AOK / Heeresgruppe Don, E.Front Promotions: SS-Stubaf.d.R.: ; SS-Hstuf.: ; |
RK: 15.01.43; EK I: 9.11.42; EK II: 1.09.41; Ostmedaille |
EICHLER, Erich | Hptm., stellv. Fhr. II./Art.Rgt.20 | 21.09.44 |
EICHLER, Hilmar | Oberst, Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 306 | 16.11.44 |
EICHLER, Kurt | Hptm., Fhr. II.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 189 | 12.08.44 |
EICHLER, Richard | Obstlt., Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 212 | 29.01.43 |
EICHLER, Wolfgang (+ 4.07.1944 as Oblt.d.R.) |
Lt.d.R., Fhr. 6.Komp./Pz.Rgt. 29 | 20.12.43 |
EICHLOFF, Otto | Feldw., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 4./KG 30 | 16.08.40 |
EICHMEIER, Hans (* 13,03.1897 in München / Bayern; + ) |
RK: Major d.R., Kdr. leichten Flak-Abt. 854(v) | RK: 11.06.44 |
EICHSTEDT, Werner (+ 26.08.1944 as Gen.Maj., Kdr. 294.Inf.Div. near Kishinev) |
RK: Oberst, Kdr. Inf.Rgt. 436 Promotions: Gen.Maj.: ; Oberst: ; |
RK: 18.08.42 |
EICK, Alfred | Oblt.z.See, Kdt. " 510 | |
EICKE, Theodor (* 17.10.1892 in Hudingen / Lothringen; + 26.02.1943 near Orelka, Russia, shot down in his Fieseler "Storch" by Soviet ground fire) |
RK: SS-Gruf.u.Gen.Lt.d.W-SS, Kdr. SS-Div. "Totenkopf" EL: SS-Ogruf.u.Gen.d.W-SS, Kdr. SS-Div. "Totenkopf" Promotions: SS-Ogruf.u.Gen.d.W-SS: ; Gen.Lt.d.W-SS: ; SS-Gruf.: ; SS-Brigf.: ; SS-Oberf.: ; SS-Staf.: ; |
RK: 26.12.41; EL (88.): 20.04.42; 1939 EK I; 1939 Sp.z.1914 EK II; 1914 EK II; Goldenes Parteiabzeichen |
EIDEL, Alfred | RK: Hptm., Fhr. I.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 171 EL: |
RK: 24.09.42; EL (283.): 22.08.43 |
EIDEN, Karl | Ofw., Zugfhr. i.d.8.(MG)Komp./Gren.Rgt. 97 | 7.03.43 |
EIKMEIER, Hans | Rittm., Fhr. II./Reiter-Rgt. 32 | 30.09.44 |
EIL, Peter | Feldw.,Zugfhr. i.d. 1.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 105 | 11.01.44 |
EILERS, Adolf | Major, Kdr. Gren.Rgt. Gruppe 184 | 10.09.44 |
EINEM, gen. ROTHMALER, Friedrich-Wilhelm | Lt.d.R., V.B. i.d. I./Art.Rgt. 230 | 4.1242 |
EINEM, Hans-Egon von | Oberst, Kdr. Pz.Gren.Rgt. 21 | 1.04.45 |
EINFALT, Johann | Obgefr., III.Btl./Jag.Rgt. 38 | RK: 28.02.45 |
EINHOFF, Georg (+ 18.02.1945 as Major) |
Oblt.d.R., Chef 8.(MG)Komp./Gren.Rgt. 366 | RK: 6.06.43 |
EISELE, Alois | RK: Hptm., Kdr. III.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 61 EL: |
RK: 15.12.43; EL (695.): 12.01.45 |
EISENACH, Franz | Hptm., Staffelkpt. 3./JG 54 | RK: 10.10.44 |
EISENBLÄTTER, Erich | Ofw., Zugf. i.d. Stabskp./Gren.Rgt. 62 | RK: 5.04.44 |
EISERMANN, Erich | Feldw., Spahhtruppfhr. i.d. 1./(Pz.Spah)/Pz.Aufkl.Abt. 23 | RK: 9.12.44 |
EISERMANN, Johannes | Oberst, Kdr. Inf.Rgt. (mot.) 156 | RK: 25.08.42 |
EISGRUBER, Johann | Feldw., Pi.Zugfhr. i.d. Stabskp./Gren.Rgt. 62 | 31.08.43 |
EISGRUBER, | RK: Obtlt., Kdr.Geb.Jäg.Rgt. 98 (kein Nachweis im Bundesarchiv Source: Lanz, Hubert, Verleihung erfolgte aufgrund früherer Vorschläger vom AOK 6 [Gen.d.Inf.Schubert] mit Verfügung IIa v. 1.6.45]) |
RK: 1.06.45 |
EISENACH, Franz | RK: Hptm., Kdr. I./JG 54 "Grünherz" 129 aerial victories (all on E. Front) in 319 sorties. |
RK: 10.10.44; DKiG; EK I; EK II |
EISL, Alois | Major, Fhr. Geb.Jag.Rgt. 98 | RK: 9.12.44 |
EITEL, Emil (Y´ 14.09.1944) |
Hptm., Kdr. III.Btl./Luftw.Jager-Rgt. 30 | RK: 8.08.44 |
EITNER, Volkhard | Hptm., Kdr. I.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 212 | RK: 10.06.43 |
EKESPARRE, Arthur von | Obstlt.i.G., Ia 13.Pz.Div. | RK: 15.01.45 |
EIBL, Josef (Y´ 10.11.1943) |
Oberst, Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 330 | RK: 22.08.43 |
ELFLEIN, Walter | Oblt.d.R., Fhr. 2./G.R. 96, E.Front (RK); Hptm.d.R., Kdr. I./G.R. 95 u. einer Kampfgruppe der 17.Inf.Div., E.Front (EL); (Final rank Major d.R.) |
RK: 8.10.43; EL (347.): 5.12.43 |
ELLMERS, Gustav | Oblt., Chef 2.Komp./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 14 | 28.02.45 |
ELLNER, Konrad (Y´ 9.12.44 in France) |
Ofw., Beob. i.d. 14.(Eis.)/KG 27 "Boelcke" | 9.06.44 |
ELTRICH, Herbert | Hptm., Kdr. Heeres-Pi.Btl. (mot.) 52 | 9.12.43 |
ELVERFELDT, Harald Freiherr von | RK: Gen.Maj., Fhr. 9.Pz.Div. EL: Promotions: |
9.12.44; EL (801.): 23.03.45 |
EMIG, Hans (Y´ 28.06.1941 on the Stalin Canal) |
Obstlt., Kdr. Kampfgr. 806 (Luftwaffe) | 21.08.41 |
EMMERLING, Heinz | Hptm.d.R., Kdr. II.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 464 | 23.02.44 |
EMMERMANN, Carl | RK: Kaptlt., Kdt. "U 172" EL: |
RK: 27.11.42; EL (256.): 4.07.43; EK I; EK II |
EMMERT, Dr. Ernst (Y´ 22.01.1945 as Obstlt., Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 282) |
Oblt., Fhr. I.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 282 | RK: 31.12.41; EK I; EK II |
ENDELL, Werner | Kapt.z.See, Hafenkdt. St. Malo (France) | RK: 18.08.44 |
ENDER, Eduard | Ofw., Zugf. i.d. 1./Pz.Jager-Abt. 49 | 23.02.44 |
ENDER, Hans | Hptm., Fhr. II./Gren.Rgt. 545 | 5.04.45 |
ENDRAß, Engelbert (* 2.03.1911 in Bambrg; Y´ 21.12.1941 northeast of the Azores, Atlantic) |
RK: Oblt.z.See, Kdt. "U 46" EL: Kaptlt., Kdt. "U 46" |
RK: 5.09.40; EL (14.): 10.06.41; EK I; EK II |
ENDRES, Hans | Hptm., Fhr. I./Pz.Art.Rgt. 74 | 14.08.43 |
ENDRES, Theodor | Gen.Lt.z.V., Kdr. 212.Inf.Div. Promotions: |
13.07.40 |
ENDRESS, Hans (* 5.07.1911 in Stuttgart; Y´ 24.01.1969 in Stuttgart) |
SS-Hstuf.d.R., Fhr. II.Btl./SS-Pz.Gren.Rgt. 6 "Theodor Eicke" / 3.SS-Pz.Div. "Totenkopf" / IV.SS-Pz.Korps / Heeresgruppe Süd, E.Front) | RK: 23.03.45; DKiG: 4.06.44; EK I: 10.12.41; EK II: 26.07.41; Nahkampfspange; |
ENDRIß, August | Hptm.d.R., Chef 4./Art.Rgt. 219 | RK: 14.08.43 |
ENGBRECHT, Herbert (+ 7.08.1942) |
Hptm., Kdr. III.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 3 | RK: 23.11.43 |
ENGEL, Gerhard | RK: Obstlt., Kdr. Füs.Rgt. 27 EL: |
RK: 4.07.44; EL (679.): 11.12.44; EK I; EK II |
ENGEL, Heinrich | Uffz., Geschützfhr. i.d. 2./Sturmgeschütz-Abt. 259 | RK: 2.11.43 |
ENGEL, Hermann | Hptm., Kdr. I.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 1122 | RK: 17.03.45 |
ENGEL, Otto | RK: Lt.d.R., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 1./KG 53 "Legion Kondor" (RK); |
RK: 28.02.45; DKiG; EK I; EK II; Frontflug-Spange für Kampfflieger in Gold mit Anhänger (500+ missions); Verw.Abz.i.Schwarz; Ostmedaille |
ENGEL, Walter (+ 05.1945, apparently killed in accident) |
Hptm., Staffelkpt. 3./NJG 5 | 28.02.45 |
ENGELBRECHT, Erwin | Gen.Maj., Kdr. 163.Inf.Div. | RK: 9.05.40 |
ENGELBRECHT, Wilhelm (* 5.09.1911 in Kaakstedt / Kreis Templin / Brandenburg) |
RK: SS-Hstuf.u.Hptm.d.Schupo, Fhr. II.Btl./SS-Polizei-Regiment 19 beim Hoheren SS-u.Polizeiführer im Bereich des Militarbefehlshabers Frankreich, OB West | RK: 11.12.44; EK I: 1.08.44; EK II: 21.11.43; KVK II; Med.z.Erinnerung a.d. 1.10.38 |
ENGELHARDT, Günter | RK: Oberst, Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 30 (mot.) | RK: 9.04.43 |
ENGELHARDT, Johann | RK: Oblt., Chef 8./Fsch.Jäger-Rgt. 6 | RK: 29.02.44 |
ENGELHARDT, Kurt | Owm., Zugf. i.d. 2./Heeres-St.Gesch.Brig. 232 | RK: 28.02.45 |
ENGLIEN, Fritz | Major, Kdr. Div.Füsilier-Btl. (A.A.) 15 | RK: 18.12.44 |
ENGELIEN, Hans (+___; after capitulation in Kurland [9.05.1945]) |
RK: Major, Fhr. Pz.Aufkl.Abt. 12 EL: Obstlt., Kdr. Pz.Gren.Rgt. 25 |
RK: 12.08.44; EL (788.): 27.03.45 |
ENGELMANN, Richard (+ 19.10.44 at HVP Jampils due to wounds) |
Hptm., Chef 1./St.Gesch.Brig. 912 | RK: 27.07.44 |
ENGFER, Alfred (+ 1.09.1942) |
Hptm., Kdr. III.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 523 | RK: 13.09.42 |
ENGFER, Siegfried | Feldw., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. III./JG 3 "Udet" |
RK: 2.10.42; EK I; EK II |
ENGLER, Alfred | Major, Fhr. Gren.Rgt. 97 | 18.11.44 |
ENNECCERUS, Walter | Hptm., Kdr. II./Stuka-Geschw. 2 "Immelmann" | 21.07.40; EK I; EK II |
ENS, Karl | Major, Kdr. II.Btl./Inf.Rgt. (mot.) 125 | RK: 14.05.41 |
ENSELING, Rudolf (* 30.08.1914 in Karlsruhe / Baden; Ý 25.01.1977 in Karlsruhe / Baden) |
SS-Stubaf., Kdr. I.Abt./SS-Pz.Rgt. 2 / 2.SS-Pz.Div. "Das Reich" / Heeresgruppe B, W.Front Promotions: SS-Ostubaf.: ; SS-Stubaf.: ; |
RK: 23.08.44; DKiG: 9.07.42; EK I: 3.08.41; EK II: 27.07.40; Nahkampfspange |
ENSLE, Wolfgang | Fhj.Feldw., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 3./Schlacht-Geschw. 2 "Immelmann" | RK: 8.08.44 |
ENßLE, Alfred | Hptm., Staffelkpt. 2./KG 76 | RK: 31.12.43 |
ENZENSBERGER, Josef | Ofw., Flugzeugfhr. | RK: 28.02.45 |
EPPEN, Heinrich | Oblt., Staffelkpt. i.d. I./Stuka-Geschw. 3 | RK: 5.07.41 |
ERASMUS, Johannes | Major i.G., Ia XXVIII.Pz.Korps | RK: 13.04.44 |
ERATH, Ludwig | Uffz., Tr.Fhr. i.d. 8.Komp./Gren.Rgt. 351 | RK: 24.12.44 |
ERDMANN, Albrecht (Ý 15.04.1942) |
Obstlt., Kdr. I./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 3 | RK: 12.09.41 |
ERDMANN, Armin | Oblt., Fhr. 6.Komp./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 79 | RK: 31.01.43 |
ERDMANN, Hans (Ý 7.12.1942) |
Hptm., Kdr. I.Btl./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 3 | RK: 10.12.42 |
ERDMANN, Otto | Lt., Fhr. 2.Komp./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 66 | RK: 9.12.44 |
ERDMANN, Rudolf Paul (* 22.07.1897 in Altona an der Elbe (= Hamburg-Altona); + 14.05.1959 in Speyer) |
RK: Oberst, Kdr. Flak-Rgt. (mot.) 153 | RK: 27.02.45 |
ERDMANN, Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang (* 13.11.1898 in Königsberg / Preußen; + 5.09.1946 in British captivity, Münsterlager) |
RK: Gen.Lt., Kdr. 7.Fsch.Jag.Div. / 1.Armee / Heeresgruppe C | RK: 8.02.45 |
ERDMANNSDORFF, Gottfried von (* 25.04.1893 in Kamenz / Saarland; Ý 1946, hanged by Soviets in Minsk for his activities as Gen.Maj., Kdr. of Mogilew and Div. Nr. 465) |
Oberst, Kdr. Inf.Rgt. 171 Promotions: Gen.Maj.: 1.12.42; Oberst: 1.06.39; Obstlt.: 1.10.36; Major: ; Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt.: 24.02.14 (P. 22.06.12); Fahnr.: 8.02.13 |
RK: 20.03.42; DKiG |
ERDMANNSDORFF, Werner von (* 26.07.1891 in Bautzen; Ý 1945 in Laibach (Ljubljana/Slovenia) as Gen.d.Inf., Kom.Gen. LXXXXI.Armee-Korps in the Balkans; Killed by partisans) |
RK: Oberst, Kdr. Inf.Rgt. (mot.) 30 Promotions: Gen.d.Inf.: 30.01.45; Gen.Lt.: 1.01.43; Gen.Maj.: 1.03.42; Oberst: 1.02.38; Obstlt.: 1.08.35; Major: ; Hptm.: ; Oblt.: ; Lt.: 8.09.12 (Pat. 25.08.10); Einj.Freiw.: 1.10.10 |
RK: 8.03.42; DKiG |
ERDMENGER, Hans (Ý 27.12.1943 as Kapt.z.See, Chef 8.Zerstörerflottille) |
Korv.Kpt., Kdt. Zerstörer "Wilhelm Heidkamp" | RK: 3.11.40; EK I; EK II |
ERLER, Rudolf | Oberst d.R., Kdr. Gren.Rgt. 538 | RK: 15.03.43 |
ERMONEIT, Helmut | Oblt., Adj. II./KG 4 "General Wever" | RK: 8.08.44 |
ERNST, Albert | Lt., Zugf. i.d. 1.Komp./schw.Pz.Jäger-Abtl. 519 | RK: 22.01.44 |
ERNST, Heinrich | Ofw., stellv. Fhr. 2./Pz.Aufkl.Abt. 9 | RK: 22.03.45 |
ERNST, Otto | Hptm., Kdr. II.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 725 | RK: 6.10.44 |
ERNST, Richard | Obstlt., Kdr. Geb.Jäg.Rgt. 100 | RK: 20.10.44 |
ERTEL, Karl-Heinz (* 26.11.1919 in Brambauer bei Lunen / Westfalen; + 25.01.1993 in Lippstadt) |
RK: SS-Hstuf., Rgts.Adjutant SS-Freiw.Pz.Gren.Rgt. 49 "de Ruyter" / SS-Freiw.Pz.Gren.Brig. "Nederland" / III.(germ.)SS-Pz.Korps / Heeresgruppe Nord, Northeastern Front | RK: 23.08.44; EK I: 7.01.44; EK II: 19.10.42; Nahkampfspange; Ostmedaille |
ERTEL, Reinhold (+ 22.01.1945) |
Oblt., Bttr.Fhr. i.d. St.Gesch.Abt. 276 | RK: 31.01.44 |
ERTOLITSCH, Franz | Obgefr., MG.-Schtz. 1 i.d. 6.Komp./Pz.Gren.Rgt. 12 | RK: 9.01.45 |
ESCH, Albin | Major, Kdr. III.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 85 | RK: 13.06.41 |
ESCHENBACHER, Georg (+ 9.01.1944) |
Ofw., Zugf. i.d. 4.(M.G.)Komp./Gren.Rgt. 451 | RK: 24.09.43 |
ESCHMANN, Fritz | Oblt., Fhr. 4.Komp./Feldersatz-Btl. 116 | RK: 12.08.44 |
ESEBECK, Hans-Karl Freiherr von | RK: Oberst, Kdr. 6.Schützen-Brigade Promotions: |
RK: 4.07.40; 1939 Sp.z.1914 EK I; 1939 Sp.z.1914 EK II; 1914 EK I; 1914 EK II |
ESKE, Otto (+ 8.11.1941) |
Feldw., Zugfhr. i.d. 5.Komp./Inf.Rgt. 4 | RK: 27.07.41 |
EßBACH, Gotthard | Oblt., Chef 9.Komp./Inf.Rgt. 31 | RK: 22.09.41 |
ESSIG, Richard | Hptm.d.R., Fhr. I.Btl./Gren.Rgt. 273 | RK: 2.09.44 |
EßLINGER, Willi (* 2.06.1916 in Markertshofen / Württemberg; 25.08.1944 on E.Front) |
RK: SS-Hschaf., 3./Pz.Jager-Abt. / SS-Pz.Gren.Div. "Wiking" / Pz.AOK 1 / Heeresgruppe Süd, E.Front | RK: 19.06.43; EK I: 13.07.41; EK II: 27.05.40; Allg.Stu.Abz. |
ETTEL, Wolf-Udo | RK: Lt., Staffelfhr. 4./JG 3 "Udet" EL: |
RK: 1.06.43; EL (289.): 31.08.43; EK I; EK II |
ETTHÖFER, Alois (* 3.04.1912 in Margetsochheim / Franken / Bayern; Ý 20.11.1944; Killed in action near Hutvan, Hungary) |
SS-Stubaf., Kdr. SS-Pz.Abt. 4 / 4.SS-Polizei-Pz.Gren.Div., Southeastern Front | RK: 17.03.45; DKiG: 23.10.42; EK I: 3.10.41; EK II: 20.09.41; Allg.Stu.Abz.i.Silber; Ostmedaille |
ETZOLD, Gerhard (+ 6.05.1941) |
Oblt., Kradschtz.Btl. 8 | RK: 3.06.40 |
EULENBURG, Jonas Graf zu (+ 8.04.1945; Killed in Action, Stadtforst Bunzlau [Schlesien]) |
Oberst, Kdt. Festung Glogau | RK: 22.03.45 |
EULING, Karl-Heinz (* 16.08.1919 in Dorndorf/Rhon) |
RK: SS-Hstuf., Btls.Kdr. IV.Btl./SS-Pz.Gren.Rgt. 21 / 10.SS-Pz.Div. "Frundsberg" / II.SS-Pz.Korps / Heeresgruppe B, W.Front | RK: 15.10.44; EK I: 14.09.43; EK II: 21.12.42; Nahkampfspange; Inf.Stu.Abz.; |
EVERLING, Wolfgang | Hptm.d.R., Chef 3./Pz.Rgt. 36 | RK: 10.02.45 |
EVERS, Franz | Lt., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 3./Fernaufkl.Gruppe 121 | RK: 17.10.41 |
EVERS, Walter (+ 28.12.43 as Hptm.d.R. u.Btl.Kdr.) |
Lt.d.R., Fhr. 11.Komp./Inf.Rgt. 271 | RK: 4.12.41 |
EVERTH, Wolfgang | Hptm., Fhr. Pz.Aufkl.Abt. 3 | RK: 6.07.42 |
EWALD, Edwin | Lt., Zugf. i.d. 2./Pi.Btl. 298 | RK: 21.08.41 |
EWALD, Heinz | Lt., Flugzeugfhr. i.d. 5./JG 52 | RK: 20.04.45; EK I; EK II |
EWALD, Werner | Major, Kdr. II./Fsch.Jäg.Rgt. 2 | RK: 9.12.42 |
EWERT, Heins-Martin | Hptm., Kdr. II.Btl./Inf.Rgt. 2 | RK: 23.11.41 |
EYMER, Herbert |
Oberst, Kdr. Pz.Gren.Rgt. 104 | RK: 18.04.43 |
EYSSEN, Robert | RK: Konteradmiral, Kdr. Hilfskreuzer "Komet" Promotions: |
RK: 29.11.41 |
EYSSER, Oskar | Hptm., Chef 4.Komp./Pz.Rgt. 31 | RK: 3.11.44 |