HSH Fürst Friedrich Wilhelm of Nassau
(Born as: HSH Prince Friedrich Wilhelm of Nassau-Weilburg)
(Since April 16th, 1770:) HSH Hereditary Prince Friedrich Wilhelm of Nassau-Weilburg
(Since November 28th, 1788:) HSH Fürst Friedrich Wilhelm of Nassau-Weilburg
* The Hague, October 25th, 1768
(fall from the stairs) Schloß Weilburg, Weilburg, January 9th, 1816
Hereditary Prince of Nassau-Weilburg, April 16th, 1770.
Fürst of Nassau-Weilburg, November 28th, 1788. In July 1806 Fürst Friedrich Wilhelm and his distant cousin Fürst Friedrich
August of Nassau-Usingen merged their principalities into the Duchy Nassau which they jointly ruled, Friedrich August
with the title Duke of Nassau, and Friedrich Wilhelm with the title Fürst of Nassau. In the same year the Duchy Nassau
joined the Confederation of the Rhine and was enlarged with the counties Holzappel, Wied-Runkel and Diez, as well as
several baronies and lordships.
Colonel of the Regiment "Overijssel" of the Cavalry and Captain of the Grenadiers of the Republic of the United
Netherlands, 1770 (resigned his commissions: 1784).
Knight of the Order of the Elephant.
Married:
Hachenburg, July 31st, 1788:
Luise Isabella Alexandrina Augusta Gräfin zu Sayn-Hachenburg, Burggräfin zu Kirchberg
* Hachenburg, April 19th, 1772
Vienna, January 6th, 1827
Heiress to Hachenburg and Kirchberg.
Children from this marriage:
(protestant) Schloßkirche, Schloß Weilburg and (catholic) Weilburg an der Lahn, September
17th, 1815:
HI & RH Prince Imperial and Archduke Karl
Ludwig Johann Joseph Lorenz of Austria, Prince Royal of Hungary and Bohemia,
Prince of Tuscany
(Since February 10th, 1822:) HI & RH Prince Imperial and Archduke Karl Ludwig Johann Josef Lorenz
of Austria, Prince Royal of Hungary and Bohemia, Duke of Teschen
* Villa Poggio Imperiale, Poggio a Caiano near Florence, September 5th, 1771
Vienna, April 30th, 1847
Governor-General of the Austrian Netherlands, 1793-1794. President of the Imperial Council of War, 1801-1806.
Minister of War and the Navy, 1806-1809. Commander of Mainz, 1815. Duke of Teschen, February 10th, 1822.
Major-General, 1793. General-Fieldmarshal, 1796. Commander-in-Chief of the Austrian Army at the River Rhine,
1796-1797 and 1799-1801. Fieldmarshal, 1801. Commander-in-Chief of the Austrian Army in Italy, 1805-1809.
Married:
(morganatic) in Switzerland, June 7th or July 7th, 1840:
Anna Ritter Edle von Vallyemare
* Vienna, June 21st, 1802
Paris (XVIth Arrondissement), July 19th, 1864
Created Gräfin von Tiefenbach by HSH Fürst Heinrich XX Reuß: Karlsbad, July 7th, 1840 (acknowledged by HIM
Emperor Ferdinand of Austria: Vienna, March 31st, 1845).
Child from this marriage:
Married:
Paris (Ist Arrondissement), October 30th, 1856:
Emile de Girardin
* Paris, June 22nd, 1806
Paris (XVIth Arrondissement), April 27th, 1881
(Separated: April 26th or October 26th, 1872)
HDSH Duke
Wilhelm Georg August Heinrich Belgicus of Nassau
(Born as: HSH Hereditary Prince Wilhelm Georg August Heinrich Belgicus of Nassau-Weilburg)
(Since January 9th, 1816:) HSH Fürst Wilhelm Georg August Heinrich Belgicus of Nassau
* Kirchheimbolanden, June 14th, 1792
Kissingen, August 20th, 1839
Hereditary Prince of Nassau-Weilburg, June 14th, 1792.
Fürst of Nassau, January 9th, 1816. Duke of Nassau, March 24th, 1816.
Children from the first marriage:
Children from the second marriage:
Schloß Biebrich near Wiesbaden, September 26th, 1853:
HSH Fürst Georg III Viktor of Waldeck and Pyrmont, Graf zu Rappolstein, Herr zu Hoheneck und Geroldseck
* Arolsen, January 14th, 1831
Marienbad, May 12th, 1893
Fürst of Waldeck and Pyrmont, May 15th, 1845.
Lieutenant-General of the Army of Prussia.
Schloß Biebrich near Wiesbaden, June 6th, 1857:
HM King Oscar II Fredrik of Sweden and Norway
(Since June 7th, 1905:) HM King Oscar II Fredrik of Sweden
(Born as: HRH Prince Oscar Fredrik of Sweden, Duke of Östergötland)
* Royal Palace, Stockholm, January 21st, 1829
Royal Palace, Stockholm, December 8th, 1907
Heir Pressumptive to the Throne of Sweden and Norway, July 8th, 1859.
King of Sweden and Norway, September 18th, 1872 (crowned: Slotkyrkan, Stockholm, May 12th, 1873 and Nidaros
Domkirke, Trondheim, July 18th, 1873; deposed as King of Norway by Act of Parliament: June 7th, 1905; abdicated as
King of Norway: October 26th, 1905).
Back to:
Last updated: December 2nd, 2007.